HI SB229 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB229
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires departments to submit their annual reports concerning their non-general fund accounts to the Auditor in addition to the Legislature. Requires departments to include the status of implementing any recommendations made by the Auditor, and if no action has been taken, to detail the reasons why any recommendation has not been implemented in their annual reports submitted regarding their non-general fund accounts. Requires the Auditor to include, in its annual report to the Legislature on special, revolving, and trust funds, identification of any unimplemented fund recommendations made in an earlier auditor's report. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Office Of The Auditor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House Legislative Management: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-24 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1019), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-15 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Morikawa, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Monday, 03-15-21 2:00PM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to LMG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 173) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 919) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 547) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 016. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB229 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.