HI SB2469 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to CPH, JDL.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to CPH, JDL.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires patient approval prior to the delivery of any medical services through telehealth. Prohibits health insurance companies from limiting the setting where telehealth services are provided or requiring in-person contact between a patient and physician before the delivery of telehealth services.
Title
Telehealth; Telemedicine; Health Insurance; Physicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2577 (Same As) 2016-02-05 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2469&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2469_.HTM |