HI SB2527 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the EARN Hawaii program to administer grants to strategic industry partnerships for job skills training. Requires DLIR to develop and implement a state employment advancement strategy. Requires DLIR to develop the "Train Hawaii" website. Requires DLIR to convene a working group of stakeholders to advise on the initial develop and implementation of the EARN Hawaii program. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Department of Labor and Industrial Relations; Workforce Development; Hawaii Employment Advancement Right Now Program; EARN Hawaii; State Employment Advancement Strategy; Train Hawaii Website ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2452) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2527&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2527_.HTM |