HI SCR107 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (H) Referred to HAW/WLO/ERB, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 66
Pending: House Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (H) Referred to HAW/WLO/ERB, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 66
Pending: House Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Senate Committees On Hawaiian Affairs And Economic Development And Technology To Convene A Special Task Force On Hawaiian Historical Sites Preservation.
Title
Governor's Special Task Force; Hawaiian Historical Sites Preservation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to HAW/WLO/ERB, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 717) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from HWN/EDT/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3465) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Fukunaga, Ryan, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Tokuda. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ryan, English, Kidani, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Hee, Kahele. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN/EDT/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-12 11:15AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Re-Referred to HWN/EDT/WAM. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) Re-Referred to ENE/WLH/WAM. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) Recommitted to HWN/EDT. | |
2012-04-02 | (S) Deferred until 04-03-12. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) One Day Notice 04-02-12. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from HWN/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3078) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Ryan, Kidani, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Hee, Kahele. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-12 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to HWN/EDT. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) Offered. |