IA SF541 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1032.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1032.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the integration of Medicaid and healthy and well kids in Iowa program eligibility, payment, and administrative functions under the department of human services. (Formerly SSB 1210.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the integration of Medicaid and healthy and well kids in Iowa program eligibility, payment, and administrative functions under the department of human services. (Formerly SSB 1210.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 1032. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | HF 625 substituted. S.J. 1031. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 625. S.J. 697. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 508. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 501. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB183 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382.
SSB1210 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF625 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082.
SSB1210 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF625 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF541 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF541.html |