IL HB4875 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Right of Publicity Act. Grants additional enforcement rights and remedies to recording artists. Provides for the liability of any person who materially contributes to, induces, or otherwise facilitates a violation of a specified provision of the Act by another party after having reason to know that the other party is in violation. Defines "artificial intelligence" and "generative artificial intelligence". Changes the definition of "commercial purpose" and "identity".
Title
PUBLICITY ACT-USE OF AI
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 006-003-000 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments: |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-024-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-005-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-003-000 |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 1075 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1075 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1075 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |