IL SB0057 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0056
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0056
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community Behavioral Health Care Professional Loan Repayment Program Act. Provides that the grant amount awarded may not exceed (i) $40,000 per year (instead of $35,000 per year) for a psychiatrist, (ii) $20,000 per year (instead of $15,000 per year) for an advanced practice registered nurse or a physician assistant, (iii) $20,000 per year (instead of $12,000 per year) for a psychologist who holds a doctoral degree, (iv) $15,000 per year for a licensed clinical social worker, a licensed clinical professional counselor, or a licensed marriage and family therapist (instead of $6,500 per year for a licensed clinical social worker or a licensed clinical professional counselor), and (v) $4,000 per year for a substance use professional, a certified alcohol and drug counselor, or a certified recovery support specialist (instead of $2,500 per year for a substance use professional). Provides that awards shall also be given for up to $12,000 per year for a professional possessing a master's degree in counseling, psychology, social work, or marriage and family therapy and $6,000 per year for a professional possessing a bachelor's degree in counseling, psychology, or social work. Provides that no less than 30% of the funding for grants each fiscal year shall be reserved for awards to minority applicants of African American or Black, Hispanic or Latinx, Asian, or Native American origin. Provides that if the Illinois Student Assistance Commission does not receive enough applications from qualified minorities on or before January 1 of a given fiscal year to award 30% of the funding to qualified minority applicants, then the Commission may award a portion of these reserved funds to other qualified applicants. In provisions concerning eligibility, requires an applicant to have worked in a community mental health center, behavioral health clinic, substance use treatment center or State-operated psychiatric hospital licensed or certified by the Department of Human Services or the Department of Healthcare and Family Services (instead of in a community mental health center). Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
HIGHR ED-LOAN REPAYMENT AWARDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0056 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2024 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2023-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2023-05-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2023-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-04-11 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-03-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Behavioral and Mental Health; 008-000-000 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Behavioral and Mental Health |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Behavioral and Mental Health |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 996 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 996 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |