IL SB2006 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the evidence-based funding provisions of the School Code. Provides that the Minimum Funding Level is equal to $550,000,000 (instead of $350,000,000). Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
SCH CD-MINIMUM FUNDING LEVEL
Sponsors
Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Cristina Pacione-Zayas [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] |
Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Sen. Javier Cervantes [D] | Sen. Mike Simmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Appropriations- Education |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations- Education |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 18-8.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2006&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2006.htm |