IL SB3467 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology Practice Act. Makes changes in provisions concerning the educational requirements for licensure as a speech-language pathology assistant. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
SPEECH-LANGUAGE PATH ASSISTANT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 110 | 8.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |