IN HB1335 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - First Reading: Referred to Insurance
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - First Reading: Referred to Insurance
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the legislative council to assign to an interim study committee for study during the 2014 interim the topic of implementation of a high cost management program for individuals who incur more than $1,500,000 in health care costs due to a chronic disease or injury.
Title
High cost management study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-29 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Insurance - Roll Call 133501 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Insurance - Roll Call 133501 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Insurance |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 94 and nays 0 |
2014-01-29 | House | Senator Pat Miller added as sponsor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-23 | House | Representative C. Brown added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-23 | House | Representative Lehman added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading: Referred to Insurance |
2014-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative T. Brown. |