LA HB532 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to fees charged for certain military honor license plates and the processing of plates at the office of motor vehicles state headquarters (EN -$44,000 SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to fees charged for certain military honor license plates and the processing of plates at the office of motor vehicles state headquarters (EN -$44,000 SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 532 FINAL PASSAGE (#575) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 532 FINAL PASSAGE (#23) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 532 FINAL PASSAGE (#23) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2023. |
2023-06-07 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 174. |
2023-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-04-17 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-04-17 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2023. |
2023-04-12 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2023-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |