MA H2143 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Capano of Lynn, a petition of Peter Capano and others that the Department of Public Health create a process for state receivership for certain hospitals or free-standing clinics that provides essential health services. Public Health.
Title
Preserving access to hospital services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1175 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S736 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H1223 (Similar To) 2023-06-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1450 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - House concurred
S742 (Similar To) 2023-06-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S736 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H1223 (Similar To) 2023-06-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1450 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - House concurred
S742 (Similar To) 2023-06-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2143 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2143.pdf |