MA H2948 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a tax credit for veterans' license plates. Revenue.
Title
Establishing a tax credit for veteran license plates
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Scanlon [D] | Sen. Adam Gomez [D] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2247 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2632
H3380 (Similar To) 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3380 (Similar To) 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2948 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2948.pdf |