MA H3520 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4521
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4521
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4521
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the siting of marijuana facilities. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Providing further transparency in the siting of marijuana facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4521 |
2019-07-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1984 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
H2833 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4210
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
H4521 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1984 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
H2833 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4210
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
H4521 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3520 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3520.pdf |