MA H4026 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the town manager act for the town of Arlington relative to the appointment of the town manager. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the town manager act of Arlington relative to the appointment of the town manager
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-12-07 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-10-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-10-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-10-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-10-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2023 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-08-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-07-31 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4028 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H4027 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
H3165 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H2801 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4236 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4027 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
H3165 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H2801 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4236 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4026 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4026.pdf |