MA H437 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4416
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4416
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4416
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the training, assessment, and assignment of qualified school interpreters in educational settings. Education.
Title
Relative to the training, assessment, and assignment of qualified school interpreters in educational settings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4416 |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S253 (Similar To) 2024-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2587
S2587 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4416 (Replaced by) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2587 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4416 (Replaced by) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H437 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H437.pdf |