MA H607 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S33
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to ensuring continuous healthcare coverage for youth who have aged-out of the Department of Children and Families. Health Care Financing.
Title
Ensuring continuous healthcare coverage for youth who have aged-out of the Department of Children and Families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-23 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-05-23 | House | Accompanied by S33 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-04-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S234 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2071
S215 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S307 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S1381 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1000 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H642 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1011 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H890 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2071 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2113
H315 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S2128 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2306 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2355
S33 (Replaces) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H607
S215 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S307 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S1381 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1000 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H642 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1011 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H890 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2071 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2113
H315 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S2128 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2306 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2355
S33 (Replaces) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H607
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H607 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H607.pdf |