MD HB611 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission submit changes of specified regulations to the Secretary of Budget and Management; repealing a provision stating that failure of the Secretary to act within a specified time period on receipt of a specified regulation constitutes approval; repealing a requirement that the Commission file a specified list of positions and salaries with the Secretary; etc.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Human Resources
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-04 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Examinations
Public Employees
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
Veterans
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Examinations
Public Employees
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
Veterans
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Work, Labor and Employment