MD SB734 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each county board of education, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, to ensure that a certain student is screened to identify if the student is at risk for reading difficulties; requiring the screening instrument to be based on foundational reading skills that include phonological and phonemic awareness and processing; requiring the county board to provide supplemental reading instruction and parental notification in cases where it is determined a student is at risk for reading difficulties; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512
2019-04-02SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-02SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {255465/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {864034/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
2019-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {864034/1
2019-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0734&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0734f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0734t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0734e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_512_sb0734e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0734_86403401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0734_25546501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb0734.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0734_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0617.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0734_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0950.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0938.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback