MI HB5688 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 392'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 392'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local government; authorities; municipal lighting authority act; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5705'12, SB 0970'12
Title
Local government; authorities; municipal lighting authority act; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5705'12, SB 0970'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 818 (Y: 60 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 800 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 408 (Y: 77 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 407 (Y: 79 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 800 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 408 (Y: 77 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 407 (Y: 79 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | House | Assigned Pa 392'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/19/2012 @ 5:40 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/19/2012 @ 3:26 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/17/2012 @ 4:50 Pm |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Roll Call # 818 Yeas 60 Nays 49 |
2012-12-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-5 Concurred In |
2012-12-04 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-04 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-5 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 800 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-5 As Amended |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Substitute S-5 As Amended Concurred In |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-5 And Amendment(s) |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2012-09-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2012-06-07 | House | Transmitted |
2012-06-07 | House | Roll Call # 408 Yeas 77 Nays 29 |
2012-06-07 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-06-07 | House | Passed Roll Call # 407 Yeas 79 Nays 27 |
2012-06-07 | House | Amended |
2012-06-07 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2012-06-06 | House | Postponed For The Day |
2012-06-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-06-06 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-06-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-06-06 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2012-06-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-31 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-31 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-05-30 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/30/2012 |
2012-05-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Local, Intergovernmental, And Regional Affairs |
2012-05-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-05-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Maureen Stapleton |