MI HB5731 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: driver license; extension of renewal date for certain driver licenses during a declared emergency; provide for. Amends sec. 314 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.314) & adds sec. 314c. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5729'20, HB 5735'20
Title
Traffic control: driver license; extension of renewal date for certain driver licenses during a declared emergency; provide for. Amends sec. 314 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.314) & adds sec. 314c. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5729'20, HB 5735'20
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 507 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-02 | House | Transmitted |
2020-12-02 | House | Title Amended |
2020-12-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 507 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2020-12-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-12-01 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-12-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-04-30 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/30/2020 |
2020-04-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-04-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-04-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |