MN HF211 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Governor veto
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Governor veto
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Statutory housing warranties recovery for breaches regulated.
Title
Statutory housing warranties recovery for breaches regulated.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Bunn [D] | Rep. Andrew Falk [D] | Rep. Paul Gardner [D] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] |
Sen. Bev Scalze [D] | Rep. Steve Simon [D] | Rep. Marsha Swails [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Governor veto | |
2009-05-21 | Governor's action Veto | |
2009-05-20 | Presentment date | |
2009-05-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2009-05-17 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate | |
2009-05-17 | House: Third reading as amended by the Senate | |
2009-05-17 | House: Motion prevailed | |
2009-05-17 | House: Motion to concur with Senate amendments | |
2009-05-17 | House: Returned from Senate with amendment | |
2009-05-17 | Senate: House concurred and repassed bill | |
2009-05-16 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed Rules suspended, lie-over waived | |
2009-05-15 | Senate: General Orders: To pass as amended | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: General Orders: Rule 45 amendment stricken | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: General Orders: Progress Recommendation to pass failed | |
2009-05-12 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-05-12 | Senate: Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF170 | |
2009-05-11 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2009-05-11 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2009-05-11 | House: Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-05-11 | Senate: Received from House | |
2009-05-11 | Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration | |
2009-05-04 | House: Author added Falk | |
2009-04-30 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-03-09 | House: Author added Bunn | |
2009-03-05 | House: Second reading | |
2009-03-05 | House: Committee report, to pass | |
2009-01-26 | House: Author added Liebling | |
2009-01-22 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Justice |