MN SF489 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Governor's action Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Governor's action Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reverse mortgage provisions modifications
Title
Reverse mortgage provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Tarryl Clark [D] | Sen. Stephen Dille [R] | Sen. Linda Higgins [D] | Sen. Linda Scheid [D] |
Sen. Dan Skogen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Governor's action Veto | |
2009-05-21 | Governor veto | |
2009-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2009-05-18 | Presentment date | |
2009-05-17 | Senate: House adopted SCC report and repassed bill | |
2009-05-16 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by Conference | |
2009-05-16 | House: Third reading as amended by Conference | |
2009-05-16 | House: House adopted conference committee report question recurred | |
2009-05-16 | House: Motion did not prevail | |
2009-05-16 | House: Motion to return bill to conference committee | |
2009-05-16 | House: Motion to adopt conference committee report | |
2009-05-16 | House: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2009-05-16 | House: Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed | |
2009-05-15 | Senate: Third reading | |
2009-05-15 | Senate: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2009-05-15 | Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill | |
2009-05-14 | Senate: House conferees Davnie; Doty; Kohls | |
2009-05-13 | House: House conferees Davnie, Doty, Kohls | |
2009-05-13 | House: House accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed | |
2009-05-13 | House: Senate conferees Clark, Fobbe, Vandeveer | |
2009-05-13 | House: Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: Senate conferees Clark; Fobbe; Vandeveer | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: Returned from House with amendment | |
2009-05-12 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2009-05-12 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2009-05-12 | House: Amended | |
2009-05-11 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-04-16 | House: Second reading | |
2009-04-16 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register | |
2009-04-14 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF528 | |
2009-04-14 | House: Received from Senate | |
2009-04-07 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed Rules suspended, lie-over waived | |
2009-04-06 | Senate: General Orders: To pass as amended | |
2009-03-25 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-03-25 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-03-09 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary | |
2009-02-05 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-02-05 | Senate: Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |