MS HB643 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-43-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Procedure For Executing And Distributing School Textbook Publishing Contracts; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School textbooks; clarify procedure for executing and distributing publishing contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Died On Calendar | |
2011-03-03 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Amended | |
2011-02-17 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-07 | Referred To Education | |
2011-02-03 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-02 | Passed | |
2011-01-24 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-13 | Referred To Education |