MT HJ7 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study how to cut size of OPI and reduce number of school districts
Title
Study how to cut size of OPI and reduce number of school districts
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Skees [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Missed Deadline for Interim Study Resolution Transmittal | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Education | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Scheduled for Executive Action (H) Education | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Hearing (H) Education | |
2011-01-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education | |
2011-01-24 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced | |
2011-01-19 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-01-18 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-01-17 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-01-17 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-01-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-01-17 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws11/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=7&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HJ&Z_ACTION=Find |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2011/houjoint/HJ0007_1.pdf |