MT HR3 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Support payment to Lincoln County
Title
Support payment to Lincoln County
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Cuffe [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - (H) Resolution Adopted (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | (H) Filed with Secretary of State |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-24 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Resolution Adopted |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted (H) Natural Resources |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (H) Natural Resources |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2015-04-18 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-04-17 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-04-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-04-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-04-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-04-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-04-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-04-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2015-04-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-04-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |