MT SB209 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Require provision of DPHHS services in certain counties
Title
Require provision of DPHHS services in certain counties
Sponsors
Sen. John Esp [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-04-01 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-08 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-02-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-15 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2019-02-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-02-05 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-02-05 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-01 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-01 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2019-02-01 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-25 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-06 | (C) Draft Request Received |