MT SB231 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise tax exemption laws regarding tribal recreational property
Title
Revise tax exemption laws regarding tribal recreational property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-05-06 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2013-04-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-17 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-15 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-13 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2013-04-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2013-04-11 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2013-03-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Taxation |
2013-03-09 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-08 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2013-03-08 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-03-06 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-25 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-22 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2013-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2013-02-12 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-05 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Taxation |
2013-02-04 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2013-02-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-01 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-31 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-01-31 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-29 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-29 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-28 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-25 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2013-01-14 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-12-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-30 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2012-12-28 | (C) Draft Request Received |