MT SJ25 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Summary
Joint resolution in support of Japanese affected by earthquake, tsunami
Title
Joint resolution in support of Japanese affected by earthquake, tsunami
Sponsors
Sen. Lynda Moss [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Died in Process | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Transmitted to House | |
2011-04-06 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-05 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-02 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) State Administration | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) State Administration | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration | |
2011-03-28 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-03-28 | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal | |
2011-03-28 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration | |
2011-03-28 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-03-28 | (S) Introduced | |
2011-03-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-03-19 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2011-01-13 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |