NC H12 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Ch. SL 2018-15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Ch. SL 2018-15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Community College Boards of Trustees
Title
Community College Boards of Trustees
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Burr [R] | Rep. Francis Iler [R] | Rep. John Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 73 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - A3 Turner, B. Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - A2 Turner, B. Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - A1 Potts Second Reading (Y: 80 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - A3 Turner, B. Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - A2 Turner, B. Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - A1 Potts Second Reading (Y: 80 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Ch. SL 2018-15 | |
2018-06-21 | Ratified | |
2018-06-20 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-20 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA1 |
2018-06-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/20/2018 |
2018-06-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-19 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-02 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2017-03-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2017-03-01 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/01/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-02-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-01-26 | House | Ref To Com On Education - Community Colleges |
2017-01-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed |