NC H1711 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Study FMP Development Process
Title
Study FMP Development Process
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Dewey Hill [D] | Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] | Rep. Garland Pierce [D] |
Rep. Ray Rapp [D] | Rep. Timothy Spear [D] | Rep. Alice Underhill [D] | Rep. William Wainwright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-17 | Ref to the Com on Marine Resources and Aquaculture, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1271 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate