NC H1784 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidate Payments/Early Care & Ed Provider
Title
Consolidate Payments/Early Care & Ed Provider
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-19 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2010-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1118 (Same As) 2010-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget