NC H1874 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-23 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-23 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Chapter 50B Fee Clarification
Title
Chapter 50B Fee Clarification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-06-23 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/22/2010 | |
2010-06-17 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-17 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-10 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-10 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1242 (Same As) 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-97