NC H353 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Re-ref Com On Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Re-ref Com On Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Summary
People First.
Title
People First.
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Alexander [D] | Rep. Beverly Earle [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] |
Rep. William Wainwright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-11 | Re-ref Com On Health | |
2009-03-11 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-02 | Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Health | |
2009-03-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S208 (Same As) 2011-03-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H353 |