NC H353 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - Ch. SL 2017-177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - Ch. SL 2017-177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize State Park System Expansion.-AB
Title
Authorize State Park System Expansion.-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Ch. SL 2017-177 | |
2017-07-25 | Signed by Gov. 7/25/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017 |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/06/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-05 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-15 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Appropriations |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Filed |