NC H387 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-23 - Ref To Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-23 - Ref To Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Access Confidential Info/Child Abuse/Neglect.-AB
Title
Access Confidential Info/Child Abuse/Neglect.-AB
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Alexander [D] | Rep. Rosa Gill [D] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Frank McGuirt [D] | Rep. Diane Parfitt [D] | Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - A1 Parfitt\Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - A1 Parfitt\Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2011-05-23 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-20 | Rec From House | |
2011-05-19 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2011-05-19 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-19 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed On Cal For 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-18 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-17 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C | |
2011-03-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Filed |