NC H466 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Private Protective Services Act/Fees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend Private Protective Services Act/Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-29SenateRef to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Finance
2013-04-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2013-04-29SenateRec From House
2013-04-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-04-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-04-24HousePlaced On Cal For 04/25/2013
2013-04-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2013-04-24HouseReptd Fav
2013-04-08HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2013-04-08HouseSerial Referral To Commerce and Job Development Stricken
2013-04-08HouseWithdrawn From Com
2013-04-01HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Finance
2013-04-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2013-03-27HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback