NC H847 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-16 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-16 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Parental Rights and Med. Treatment of Minors
Title
Parental Rights and Med. Treatment of Minors
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] | Rep. Dean Arp [R] | Rep. Bert Jones [R] | Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] |
Rep. Jacqueline Schaffer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - A1 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - A1 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015 |
2015-04-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary II |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed |