NC H888 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-11 - Ch. SL 2009-77
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-11 - Ch. SL 2009-77
Summary
County Bow Hunting/Mineral Rights.
Title
County Bow Hunting/Mineral Rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-11 | Ch. SL 2009-77 | |
2009-06-11 | Ratified | |
2009-06-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/10/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-09 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-06-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-03 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-03 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-28 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-04-28 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-23 | Placed On Cal For 4/27/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-22 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-04-13 | Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources | |
2009-04-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-31 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Wildlife Resources | |
2009-03-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H888 |