NC S134 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Economics & Financial Literacy Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economics & Financial Literacy Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
2019-04-03SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-03SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-14SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-26SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback