NC S217 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Early Childhood Data Analytics/Pilot/Guilford
Title
Early Childhood Data Analytics/Pilot/Guilford
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H215 (Same As) 2021-03-04 - Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgeting
Counties
Early Childhood Education
Education
Elementary Education
Funding
Grants
Guilford County
Kindergarten
Local Government
Minors
Pilot Programs
Public
Budgeting
Counties
Early Childhood Education
Education
Elementary Education
Funding
Grants
Guilford County
Kindergarten
Local Government
Minors
Pilot Programs
Public
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S217 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S217v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S217v1.pdf |