NC S539 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-07 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-07 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Summary
Greensboro Motor Vehicle Levy.
Title
Greensboro Motor Vehicle Levy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-07 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-04-02 | Placed On Cal For 4/7/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-12 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H541 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - Ch. SL 2011-154
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S539 |