NC S871 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Ch. SL 2014-47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Ch. SL 2014-47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Raleigh/Durham/Deannexation/Annexation
Title
Raleigh/Durham/Deannexation/Annexation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Ch. SL 2014-47 | |
2014-06-30 | Signed by Gov. 6/30/2014 | |
2014-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 06/30/2014 | |
2014-06-30 | Ratified | |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2014-06-30 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-06-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-06-18 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-17 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/12/2014 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2014 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Filed |