NE LB859 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change records relating to employee deaths which may be withheld from the public
Title
Change records relating to employee deaths which may be withheld from the public
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 10, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 18, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2018-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |