NE LR214 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-27 - Notice of hearing for September 04, 2015
Pending: Legislature Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-27 - Notice of hearing for September 04, 2015
Pending: Legislature Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to review the information in the Dairy Growth and Development Study Report
Title
Interim study to review the information in the Dairy Growth and Development Study Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 04, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Date of introduction |