NE LR344 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-14 - Notice of hearing for November 12, 2015
Pending: Legislature Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-14 - Notice of hearing for November 12, 2015
Pending: Legislature Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the financing of public education and to develop recommendations for improving school funding in Nebraska
Title
Interim study to examine the financing of public education and to develop recommendations for improving school funding in Nebraska
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for November 12, 2015 |
2015-08-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for November 12, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |