NH HB1265 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to coordinating and funding broadband infrastructure information by the enhanced 911 system.
Title
Relative to coordinating and funding broadband infrastructure information by the enhanced 911 system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-1) |
2014-10-07 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-03-25 | House | Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/04/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/18/2014 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/4/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy |