NH HB1287 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 136; Eff. 7/27/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 136; Eff. 7/27/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing a provision of the harassment statute.
Title
Repealing a provision of the harassment statute.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 136; Eff. 7/27/2016 |
2016-05-18 | House | Enrolled 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 128 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/12/2016); Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/05/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Hearing: 04/21/2016, Room 103, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 9 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 6 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-02 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/19/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/15/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-01-07 | House | Vacated and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety (Rep. Rowe): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 18 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 4 P. 9 |