NH HB1287 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proclaiming March as Sleep Awareness Month.
Title
Proclaiming March as Sleep Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Yokela [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2022 1:30 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |