NH HB1402 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 179; Eff. 6/8/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 179; Eff. 6/8/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to ordinances regarding forestry activities.
Title
Relative to ordinances regarding forestry activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 179; Eff. 6/8/2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/19/2018 Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 11 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 14 |
2018-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 9 |